Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/09/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/09/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/09/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/09/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/09/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/09/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/15/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/21/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/21/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/21/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/05/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/06/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/07/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/12/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/12/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/12/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/13/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/20/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/20/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/12/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/12/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 08/03/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/04/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/20/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/31/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/08/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/11/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 06/11/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/22/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew