Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/03/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/03/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 05/03/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/10/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/10/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/17/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/17/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/17/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/17/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/17/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/17/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/24/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/11/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/15/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/25/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/25/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/25/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/25/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/11/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/11/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/19/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/30/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 08/03/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/03/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/14/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/09/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 12/04/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/15/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/15/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/15/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/17/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/06/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/06/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/12/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 02/13/2008
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/10/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/03/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/22/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/30/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/13/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/19/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/22/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/03/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/03/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/09/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/29/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 10/02/2008