Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/03/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/10/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/10/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/10/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/10/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/10/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/10/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/10/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/14/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/14/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/16/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/21/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/05/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/05/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/10/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/12/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/21/2008