Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/03/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/03/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/07/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/07/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/08/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/08/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/08/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/08/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 05/08/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/10/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/10/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/14/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/16/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/16/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/16/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/17/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/17/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/17/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/17/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/21/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/21/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/21/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/22/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/22/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/23/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/23/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/23/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/23/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/24/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/24/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/07/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/07/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/07/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/07/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/07/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/07/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/07/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/07/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/07/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/07/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/14/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/14/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/14/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/14/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/14/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/25/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/25/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/25/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/25/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/25/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/25/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/25/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/25/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/25/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/28/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/28/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/28/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/11/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/11/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/11/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/12/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/12/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/12/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/12/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/19/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 07/19/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/19/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/19/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/19/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/19/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/19/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/27/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/27/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/27/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/27/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/27/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/27/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/27/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/27/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/27/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/27/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 08/03/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 08/03/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 08/03/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 08/03/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/04/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/04/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/04/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 09/07/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/10/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 09/10/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/27/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 10/04/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/10/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 11/05/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/05/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/05/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 01/22/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/22/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/13/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/13/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/31/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/08/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/08/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/17/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/17/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/17/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/17/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/24/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/19/2008
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/19/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/19/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/09/2008