Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/03/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/03/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/10/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/10/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/15/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/01/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/01/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 12/04/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/08/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/04/2008