Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/03/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/09/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/10/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/15/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/16/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 05/17/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/17/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/22/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/15/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/24/2007