Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/10/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/16/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/10/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/03/2008