Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/17/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/17/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/17/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/17/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/17/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/23/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/23/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/23/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/05/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/06/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/06/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/06/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/06/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/06/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/06/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/06/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/06/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/06/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/06/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/06/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/06/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/07/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/07/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/07/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/07/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/07/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/07/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/07/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/07/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/07/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/07/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/07/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/07/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/07/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/07/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/07/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/07/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/07/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/07/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/07/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/07/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/07/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/07/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/07/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/07/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/07/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/07/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/11/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/11/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/11/2007
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/11/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/11/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/11/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/11/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/12/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/12/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/12/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/12/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/12/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/13/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/13/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/13/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/13/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/13/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/13/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 06/13/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/13/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/13/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/13/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/13/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/15/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/15/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/19/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/20/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/20/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/21/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/28/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/28/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/07/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/24/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/24/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/27/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/04/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/04/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/04/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/01/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/01/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/08/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/19/2008