Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/16/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/25/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/10/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/25/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/15/2007

Show cosponsors who withdrew