Refine your search

Refined by:

Massachusetts Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/03/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/14/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/23/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/09/2007
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 01/22/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew