Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/21/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/11/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/11/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/22/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew