Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/03/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 05/03/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/14/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/21/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/23/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/06/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/01/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/01/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/18/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 11/08/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/15/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 12/04/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/16/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/22/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/27/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/14/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/08/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/16/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew