Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/08/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/09/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/15/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/07/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/07/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/12/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/12/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/12/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/12/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/12/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/12/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/14/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/14/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/15/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/19/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/19/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/19/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/19/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/19/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/20/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/20/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/20/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/20/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/26/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/26/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/26/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/26/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/26/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/10/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/11/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/17/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/17/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/23/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 08/02/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/26/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/04/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/22/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/27/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/04/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/20/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/21/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/03/2008