Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/07/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/10/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/10/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/10/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/10/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/16/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/14/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/20/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/25/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/31/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/01/2007