Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/11/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/17/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/23/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/25/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/30/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/31/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/31/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/31/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 08/03/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 08/03/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 08/03/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 08/03/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/05/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/05/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/10/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/10/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/17/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/25/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/02/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/09/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/17/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/23/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/24/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/25/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/29/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/15/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/15/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 01/15/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 01/29/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/03/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/03/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/31/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/08/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/14/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/14/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/14/2008
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/15/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/15/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/16/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/17/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/17/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/22/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/29/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/29/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/30/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/01/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/01/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/08/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/08/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/08/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/08/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/13/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/13/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/13/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/13/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/13/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/13/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/13/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/13/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/13/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/15/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/19/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/19/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/09/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/09/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/12/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/26/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/31/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 08/01/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 08/01/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/09/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/09/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/16/2008