Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/07/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/07/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/07/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/10/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/21/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/21/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/22/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/22/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/22/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/26/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/31/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/06/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/06/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/06/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/25/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/03/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/10/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/05/2008