Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/10/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/10/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/10/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/10/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/10/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/10/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/10/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/10/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/10/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/14/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/14/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/14/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/14/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/14/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/17/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/17/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/17/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/17/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/17/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/17/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 05/17/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/17/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/17/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/17/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/17/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/24/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/05/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/18/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/18/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/25/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/25/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/11/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/05/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/09/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 07/23/2008