Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/08/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/08/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/08/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/25/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/25/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/03/2008