Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/14/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/14/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/14/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/14/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/21/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/21/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/21/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/21/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/21/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/21/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/21/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/21/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/21/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/21/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/21/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/21/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/21/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/21/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/21/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/21/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/21/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/21/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/21/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/21/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/21/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/21/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/21/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/21/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/22/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/23/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/23/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/23/2007