Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/04/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/09/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/09/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/12/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/12/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/18/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 01/18/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 01/19/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/19/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 01/22/2007
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 01/22/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 01/22/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/22/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/22/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/22/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/24/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/24/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/24/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/31/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/16/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/16/2007