There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Retirement Security for Life Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to encourage guaranteed lifetime income payments from annuities and similar payments of life insurance proceeds at dates later than death by excluding from income a portion of such payments.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/08/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
05/08/2007Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (79)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 05/08/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/17/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/17/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/17/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/17/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/23/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/23/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/14/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/15/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/27/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/27/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/11/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/12/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/16/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/19/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/19/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/24/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 07/27/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 08/03/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 09/06/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/01/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 10/02/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/03/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/10/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/14/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/13/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/13/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/31/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/29/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/06/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/20/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/10/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/20/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/09/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/10/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/10/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/14/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/16/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/22/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/22/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/03/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/08/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2205. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/08/2007)

Retirement Security for Life Act of 2007 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow an exclusion from gross income for 50 percent of the amount otherwise includible in gross income as guaranteed payments from certain annuity or life insurance contracts. Limits the amount of such exclusion to $20,000 in any taxable year. Provides for an inflation adjustment of the $20,000 limitation beginning in 2009.