Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/17/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/17/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/11/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/11/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/27/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/31/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/12/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/20/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/20/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/20/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/20/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/20/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/20/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/20/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/20/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/20/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/20/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/20/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/20/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/20/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/20/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/20/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/20/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/20/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/20/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/20/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/20/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/20/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/20/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/08/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/08/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/08/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/08/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/08/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/14/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/14/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/14/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 07/14/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/14/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/14/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/23/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/23/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/23/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/23/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/09/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/09/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/20/2008