Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 01/09/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/09/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/23/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/23/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 06/13/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/13/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/13/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/17/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/17/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/07/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/26/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/24/2008