Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/09/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/07/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/07/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/15/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/26/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/18/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/18/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/19/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/24/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/24/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/24/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 08/03/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/19/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/19/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/25/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 10/25/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/09/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/09/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/15/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/06/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/06/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 12/06/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 12/06/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 12/17/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/17/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/17/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/09/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/24/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/22/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/05/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/05/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/05/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/05/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/05/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/05/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/12/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/11/2008