Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/23/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/20/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/31/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/31/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/10/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/20/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/23/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/23/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/04/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/16/2008