Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/09/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/09/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/09/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/09/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/09/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/09/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/09/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/09/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/09/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/09/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/06/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/06/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/06/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/14/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/19/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/31/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/05/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/18/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/15/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/15/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/31/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/31/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/31/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/14/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/29/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/13/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/20/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/08/2008