Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/14/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/14/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/10/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 08/03/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 08/03/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/07/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/07/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/07/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/03/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/03/2008