Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/06/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/06/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/06/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/06/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/06/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/06/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/06/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/06/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/06/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/06/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/06/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/08/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 10/02/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/15/2008