Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 05/09/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/09/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/09/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/09/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 05/09/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/13/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/18/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/25/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/27/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/01/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 08/01/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 08/03/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 01/22/2008