Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/24/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/24/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/19/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/19/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/19/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/19/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/19/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/19/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/19/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/24/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/24/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/24/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/24/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/24/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/24/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/24/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/24/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/24/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/24/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/24/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/24/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/24/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/24/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/24/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/24/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/04/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/25/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/25/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/25/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/25/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/25/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/25/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/25/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/25/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/25/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/02/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 10/02/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/02/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/09/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/09/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/09/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/09/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/09/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/16/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/16/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/16/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/17/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/22/2007