Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/10/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/16/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/16/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/16/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/21/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/21/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/05/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/07/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/11/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/13/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/15/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/15/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/15/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/15/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/15/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/18/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/19/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/19/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/20/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/21/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/21/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/21/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/21/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/21/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/22/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/22/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/22/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/25/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/27/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/27/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/11/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/11/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/16/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/16/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/17/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/17/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/17/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/23/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/24/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/24/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/31/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/31/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/31/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 08/02/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 08/02/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 08/02/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 08/02/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/07/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/10/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/17/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/19/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/26/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/26/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/02/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/02/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/15/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/16/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/17/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/31/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 11/01/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/15/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/18/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/19/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/07/2008