Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
11/30/2007 Became Public Law No: 110-122.
11/30/2007 Signed by President.
11/26/2007 Presented to President.
11/16/2007 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S14656-14657)
11/14/2007 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
10/01/2007 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 379 - 0 (Roll no. 925).(text: CR H11040)
05/10/2007 Introduced in House