There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To expedite the construction of new refining capacity on closed military installations in the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/10/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
06/18/2008Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. English (PA). Petition No: 110-9. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/28/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
05/10/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Air Quality.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/10/2007Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2007Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2007Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (79)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/10/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/17/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/17/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/09/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/09/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/09/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/10/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/10/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/10/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/10/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/10/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/10/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/10/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/11/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/11/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/17/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/17/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/17/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/17/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/17/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/17/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/17/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/17/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/18/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/18/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/18/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/18/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/18/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/18/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/18/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/18/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/18/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/18/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/18/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/18/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/18/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/19/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/19/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/19/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/19/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/19/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/26/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/26/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/26/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 06/26/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/26/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/10/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/10/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/10/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/10/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/10/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/15/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/15/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/17/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/17/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/17/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/17/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/24/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/31/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/31/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/10/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/17/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/23/2008

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/10/2007 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Air Quality05/10/2007 Referred to
House Armed Services05/10/2007 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Readiness06/28/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2279. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/10/2007)

Requires the President to designate not less than three closed military installations or portions thereof that are appropriate for siting a refinery for gasoline or other fuel.

Designates the Department of Energy as the lead agency for coordinating applicable federal refinery authorizations and related environmental reviews with respect to a designated refinery.

Gives the U.S. Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia exclusive jurisdiction over civil actions relating to federal refinery authorizations.