Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 05/10/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/07/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/13/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/13/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/20/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/21/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/22/2007