Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/15/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/07/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/17/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/03/2007