Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/21/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/14/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/25/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/26/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/05/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/15/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/04/2007