Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/15/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/15/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/21/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/20/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/19/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/08/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/15/2007