Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/15/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/15/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/15/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/15/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/15/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/21/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/21/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/21/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/21/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/07/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/10/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/12/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/19/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/19/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/25/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/26/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/05/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/08/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/13/2007
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/14/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/15/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 01/22/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/22/2008