Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/14/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/23/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/23/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/23/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/23/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/05/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/05/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/05/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/05/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/05/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/07/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/15/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/15/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/19/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/19/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/28/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/11/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/19/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/25/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/31/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 08/03/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/07/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/07/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/10/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/10/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/26/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/26/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/26/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/26/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/14/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/16/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/23/2008