Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 05/14/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/17/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/07/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/07/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/12/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/12/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/19/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/19/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/28/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/28/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/17/2007