Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 05/14/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 05/14/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 05/14/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/14/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/15/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/16/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/17/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/23/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/23/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/24/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/05/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/06/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/06/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/06/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/12/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/12/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/14/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/15/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/19/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/22/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/26/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/26/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/10/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/10/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/12/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/16/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 08/03/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/04/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/06/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/07/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/10/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/10/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/17/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/24/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/24/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/09/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/25/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/06/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 11/07/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/07/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/07/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/09/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 11/14/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/18/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/23/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/28/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/07/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/07/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/07/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/12/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 02/13/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/13/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 02/13/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/13/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/13/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/14/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/14/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/14/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/26/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/26/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/26/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/26/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/26/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/26/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/26/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/26/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/26/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/26/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/26/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/28/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/28/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/28/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/05/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/05/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/05/2008
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/11/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/22/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/30/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 05/08/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/08/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/11/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/11/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/08/2008