There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Advanced Geothermal Energy Research and Development Act of 2007

Short Titles as Introduced

Advanced Geothermal Energy Research and Development Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Energy to conduct a program of research, development, demonstration, and commercial application for geothermal energy, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
06/21/2007Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science and Technology. H. Rept. 110-203.
05/14/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
05/06/2008Hearing Held by Subcommittee on Energy and Environment Prior to Introduction and Referral (May 17, 2007).
Action By: House Science and Technology Subcommittee on Energy and Environment
06/21/2007Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 122.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/21/2007Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science and Technology. H. Rept. 110-203.
06/13/2007Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Science and Technology
06/13/2007Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science and Technology
06/06/2007Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Science and Technology Subcommittee on Energy and Environment
06/06/2007Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Science and Technology Subcommittee on Energy and Environment
05/31/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Science and Technology
05/14/2007Referred to the House Committee on Science and Technology.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/14/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (14)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Science and Technology05/14/2007 Referred to
06/13/2007 Markup by
06/21/2007 Reported by H. Rept. 110-203
House Science and Technology Subcommittee on Energy and Environment05/31/2007 Referred to
05/06/2008 Hearings by
06/06/2007 Markup by
06/06/2007 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2304. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (06/21/2007)

Advanced Geothermal Energy Research and Development Act of 2007 - (Sec. 4) Instructs the Secretary of Energy to support research, development, demonstration, and commercial application programs to expand geothermal energy production from hydrothermal systems.

Specifies programs to: (1) develop advanced geophysical, geochemical, and geologic tools to assist in locating hidden hydrothermal resources and increase the reliability of site characterization; and (2) demonstrate technologies and techniques of exploratory drilling for undiscovered resources in a variety of geologic settings.

(Sec. 5) Directs the Secretary to support research, development, demonstration, and commercial application of subsurface components and systems capable of withstanding extreme geothermal environments and necessary to develop, produce, and monitor geothermal reservoirs and produce geothermal energy.

Directs the Secretary also to support such programs to: (1) create models of geothermal reservoir performance; and (2) mitigate or preclude potential adverse environmental impacts of geothermal energy development, production, or use.

(Sec. 6) Directs the Secretary to support research, development, demonstration, and commercial application programs for: (1) enhanced geothermal systems; (2) enhanced geothermal systems reservoir stimulation technologies and techniques; and (3) geothermal energy production from oil and gas fields and production and recovery of energy from geopressured resources.

(Sec. 8) Sets forth federal cost share, organization, and administration requirements for projects under this Act. Requires the Secretary to allow a competitive bidding process to play a role in determining the final cost-share ratio.

(Sec. 9) Instructs the Secretary to award grants for five-year periods to institutions of higher education (or consortia of them) for establishment of two Centers for Geothermal Technology Transfer, including a Hydrothermal Center and an Enhanced Geothermal Systems Center, to serve as information clearinghouses.

(Sec. 10) Requires the Secretary to expand the Department of Energy's GeoPowering the West program, renamed "GeoPowering America," to extend its geothermal technology transfer activities throughout the entire United States. Continues to base the program in the Department of Energy office in Golden, Colorado.

(Sec. 11) Directs the Secretary to study and report to specified congressional committees on: (1) advanced technologies to maximize geothermal resources; (2) progress of projects under this Act; and (3) legal and regulatory barriers to such projects.

(Sec. 13) Authorizes appropriations for FY2008-FY2012.