Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/05/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/05/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/06/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/11/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/13/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/15/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/19/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/19/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/21/2007