Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/15/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/16/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/16/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/16/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/16/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/16/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/22/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 05/22/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/22/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/22/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/22/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/12/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/12/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/12/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/28/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/26/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/17/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/07/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/07/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/14/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/14/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/14/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/08/2008