Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 01/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 01/09/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/09/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/09/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/09/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 01/09/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/09/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 01/09/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/09/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 01/09/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/09/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/09/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 01/09/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/09/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 01/09/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/09/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/09/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 01/09/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/09/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/09/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/12/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/12/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/12/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/12/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 01/19/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/19/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 01/19/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/19/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/19/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/19/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/13/2007