Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 05/15/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/17/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/17/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/23/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/23/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/23/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/23/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/23/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/23/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/23/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/23/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/23/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/24/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/24/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/05/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/05/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/05/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/05/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/05/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/05/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/05/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/05/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/05/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/05/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/05/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/05/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/05/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/05/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/07/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/07/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/07/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/12/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/12/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/12/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/12/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/14/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/14/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/14/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/14/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/14/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/14/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/14/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/14/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/19/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/19/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/22/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/22/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/22/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/25/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/26/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/10/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/10/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/10/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/10/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/12/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/12/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/18/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/10/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/10/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/10/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/19/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/19/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/19/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/19/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/27/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/10/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 10/30/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/30/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/31/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/06/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/11/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/18/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/23/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/07/2008