Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/15/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/15/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/15/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/16/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/16/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/16/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/16/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/16/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 05/16/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/16/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/17/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/17/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/22/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/22/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/22/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/22/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/24/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/06/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/06/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/06/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/06/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/12/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/27/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/27/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/27/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/23/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/23/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/23/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/23/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/23/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/23/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/24/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/24/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/24/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/24/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 08/03/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/04/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/10/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/10/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/17/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/17/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/24/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/24/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/26/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/26/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/18/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/18/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/25/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/30/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/15/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/12/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 12/12/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/28/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 01/28/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/05/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/05/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 04/01/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/01/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/15/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 04/15/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/15/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/23/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/07/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/15/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/15/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/05/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 06/05/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/05/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/05/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/17/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/17/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/26/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 06/26/2008
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 06/26/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/10/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/10/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/10/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/15/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/01/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 08/01/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 08/01/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/09/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/09/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/09/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/09/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/23/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 10/02/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/20/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/10/2008