Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/15/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/15/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/15/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 05/15/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 05/15/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 05/15/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/22/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/22/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/22/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/13/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/13/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/28/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/13/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/13/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/13/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/13/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/13/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/13/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/24/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/24/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/24/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/24/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/24/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/26/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/26/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/26/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 08/03/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 08/03/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 08/03/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 08/03/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 08/03/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 08/03/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/17/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/17/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/17/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/17/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/17/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/26/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/26/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/27/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/27/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/03/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 10/03/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/03/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/03/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/03/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/09/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/09/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 10/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/09/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/15/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/15/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/15/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 10/22/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 10/22/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/22/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/22/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 10/22/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/22/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 10/22/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/22/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/22/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 10/22/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/22/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/25/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/06/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 11/06/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 11/06/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 11/06/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/06/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 11/06/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/15/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/15/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/15/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 11/15/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/18/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/18/2007
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/14/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/14/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/08/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/15/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/15/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/01/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/01/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/01/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/08/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/08/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/12/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/12/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/12/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/13/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/13/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/13/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/08/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 07/08/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/08/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/08/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/08/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 07/17/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/17/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/17/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 07/17/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/29/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/29/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/29/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/29/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/31/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/31/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/31/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/31/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/17/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/17/2008