Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/23/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/24/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/07/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/11/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/15/2008