Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/16/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/11/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/11/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/27/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/27/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/12/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 09/29/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/29/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/29/2008